Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Costantino Vigilante

Deceased

Bishop of Caiazzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1685³Born
16 Sep 170822.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Sep 170822.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 172742.1AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
21 Dec 172742.1Ordained BishopBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
27 Apr 175468.5DiedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Costantino Vigilante
Bishop Costantino Vigilante (born , died ) Bishop of Caiazzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolofre

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1732
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast