Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Domenico Xiberras, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1671BornMalta
5 Feb 171947.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
1 Oct 172755.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria
19 Oct 172755.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria
5 Oct 175179.8DiedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Domenico Xiberras:
Bishop Giovanni Domenico Xiberras O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 196
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015