Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspare Pizzolanti, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1674³BornLeucati
16 Jun 169622.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
2 Mar 169723.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
25 Jun 172753.3AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
13 Jul 172753.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cervia, Italy
31 Dec 176591.8DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Pizzolanti
Bishop Gaspare Pizzolanti O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Cervia

  • a priest for 68.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 155
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1727, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Jun 2016