Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Vilnius

Archidioecesis Vilnensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gintaras Linas Grušas, Archbishop
  • Arūnas Poniškaitis, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Darius Trijonis, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Audrys Juozas Bačkis, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 28 October 1925
  • Metropolitan See
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Lithuania
  • Square Kilometers: 9,644 (3,724 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://vilnius.lcn.lt/
  • Mailing Address: Sventaragio 4, LT-01122 Vilnius, Lietuva
  • Telephone: (5)262.70.98; 212.36.53
  • Fax: 212.28.07

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Vilnius
14th CenturyErectedDiocese of Vilnius (erected)
1417Territory LostDiocese of Vilnius Diocese of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź) (erected)
1655SuppressedDiocese of Vilnius (suppressed) Diocese of Curland
17 November 1798Territory AddedDiocese of Inflanty (Livonia)-Pilten (suppressed) Diocese of Vilnius
1799Territory LostDiocese of Vilnius Diocese of Wigry (erected)
Archdiocese of Vilnius
28 October 1925ElevatedDiocese of Vilnius Archdiocese of Vilnius
4 April 1926Territory LostArchdiocese of Vilnius (Giedraitens, Malėtens, Merkinens, Stakliškens, and Žaslens) Diocese of Kaišiadorys (erected)
13 April 1991Territory LostDiocese of Łomża (7 parishes)
Diocese of Pinsk (4 parishes)
Archdiocese of Vilnius (119 parishes)
Diocese of Grodno (erected) (Grodno)
5 June 1991Territory LostArchdiocese of Vilnius Diocese of Białystok (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Vilnius
19501,031,0002,300,00044.8%570255951,73253150442ap1951
1970287,945368,81378.1%23952441,1801114760ap1971
1980331,589427,40477.6%25872651,2511011771ap1981
1987800,000.0%9491030987ap1991
1999600,000845,50071.0%104351394,31614022189ap2000
2000598,000886,20067.5%106331394,30213422090ap2001
2001502,400867,20057.9%114391533,28314221591ap2002
2002470,000808,70058.1%115381533,07114322293ap2003
2003573,000814,00070.4%116381543,72014122693ap2004
2004570,000810,00070.4%111421533,72514722094ap2005
2010565,620857,74565.9%126451713,30716019896ap2011
2014558,847773,40672.3%131441753,1935417295ap2015
2017605,108827,14173.2%137371743,4775016795ap2018
2020655,229844,58577.6%132361683,9005615997ap2021
2022661,455835,03679.2%129331624,0835314797ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Vilnius
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 529
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 269
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 334
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 369, and Page 370
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 416
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 442, and Page 443
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 397
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 591, and Page 592
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 360
  • Archdiocese of Vilnius
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 17, Page 521, to Page 528
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 84, Page 274, and Page 275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 7 Apr 2024