Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Luis Cardinal Cipriani Thorne

Archbishop Emeritus of Lima, Peru

Cardinal-Priest of San Camillo de Lellis

Member of the Council for the Economy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1943 Born
21 Aug 197733.6Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
23 May 198844.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
23 May 198844.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Turuzi
3 Jul 198844.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turuzi
13 May 199551.3AppointedArchbishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga, Peru
9 Jan 199955.0AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
21 Feb 200157.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200157.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Camillo de Lellis
24 Feb 200157.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Camillo de Lellis
8 Mar 201470.1AppointedMember of the Council for the Economy
25 Jan 201975.0RetiredArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan Luis Cipriani Thorne (VIAF: 87134116)
Juan Luis Cardinal Cipriani Thorne (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima, Archdiocese of Lima
Ordained BishopLima, Archdiocese of Lima

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Lima.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2001
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,812
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2014
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 7 Feb 2019

Quantcast