Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mauro Cardinal Piacenza

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Cardinal-Deacon of San Paolo alle Tre Fontane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1944 BornGenova
21 Dec 196925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
13 Oct 200359.1AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Cultural Heritage of the Church
13 Oct 200359.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Victoriana
15 Nov 200359.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Victoriana
28 Aug 200460.0AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Sacred Archeology
7 May 200762.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Clergy
7 May 200762.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Victoriana
7 Oct 201066.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy
20 Nov 201066.2Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 201066.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Paolo alle Tre Fontane
2 Apr 201166.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Paolo alle Tre Fontane
28 Feb 201368.5CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy
16 Mar 201368.5ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy
21 Sep 201369.0AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

MicroData Summary for Mauro Piacenza:
Cardinal Mauro Piacenza (born ) Major Penitentiary of Apostolic Penitentiary

Please contact the Cardinal through the Apostolic Penitentiary.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 May 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,483
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013