Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis-Marie Ling Cardinal Mangkhanekhoun, I.V.D.

Vicar Apostolic of Paksé, Laos

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

Apostolic Administrator of Vientiane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1944 Born
5 Nov 197228.5Ordained PriestPriest of Vientiane, Laos
30 Oct 200056.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Paksé, Laos
30 Oct 200056.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari
22 Apr 200157.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Novae in Proconsulari
2 Feb 201772.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Vientiane, Laos
28 Jun 201773.2Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201773.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marie Ling Mangkhanekhoun
Louis-Marie Ling Cardinal Mangkhanekhoun I.V.D. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Paksé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBonha-Louang, Vicariate Apostolic of Vientiane
Ordained BishopSacré Coeur, Cathedral, Paksé, Vicariate Apostolic of Paksé

Please contact the Cardinal through the Vicariate Apostolic of Paksé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,965
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2017
  • card: CB, 21 May 2017
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jun 2017