Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michael Michai Cardinal Kitbunchu

Archbishop Emeritus of Bangkok

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1929 BornSamphran
20 Dec 195930.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bangkok, Thailand
18 Dec 197243.9AppointedArchbishop of Bangkok, Thailand
3 Jun 197344.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bangkok, Thailand
2 Feb 198354.0Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198354.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
14 May 200980.3RetiredArchbishop of Bangkok, Thailand

MicroData Summary for Michael Michai Kitbunchu:
Cardinal Michael Michai Kitbunchu (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bangkok

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Bangkok.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 May 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013