Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Christoph Cardinal Schönborn, O.P.

Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}

Cardinal-Priest of Gesù Divin Lavoratore

Ordinary of Austria, Faithful of Eastern Rites


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1945 BornSkalsko, Czech Republic
27 Dec 197025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Jul 199146.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
11 Jul 199146.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Sutrium
29 Sep 199146.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sutrium
13 Apr 199550.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
14 Sep 199550.6SucceededArchbishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
6 Nov 199550.8AppointedOrdinary of Austria, Faithful of Eastern Rites
21 Feb 199853.1Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 199853.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Gesù Divin Lavoratore
22 Nov 199853.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Gesù Divin Lavoratore

MicroData Summary for Christoph Schönborn:
Christoph Cardinal Schönborn O.P. (born ) Archbishop of Wien {Vienna}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino, 16 Nov 1998
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,475
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 12 Jun 2014