Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Héctor Villalba

Archbishop Emeritus of Tucumán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1934 BornBuenos Aires
24 Sep 196025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 Oct 198450.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 Oct 198450.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aufinium
22 Dec 198450.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aufinium
16 Jul 199156.7AppointedBishop of San Martín, Argentina
26 Oct 199157.0InstalledBishop of San Martín, Argentina
8 Jul 199964.7AppointedArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
17 Sep 199964.9InstalledArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
10 Jun 201176.6RetiredArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
14 Feb 201580.3Elevated to Cardinal

MicroData Summary for Luis Héctor Villalba:
Archbishop Luis Héctor Villalba (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tucumán

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tucumán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 4 Jan 2015