Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Santos Cardinal Abril y Castelló

Archpriest Emeritus of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}

Cardinal-Priest of San Ponziano


Motto: Pro Ecclesia Cum Petro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1935 Born
19 Mar 196024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pesaro, Italy
29 Apr 198549.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamada
29 Apr 198549.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
16 Jun 198549.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tamada
2 Oct 198954.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Cameroun
2 Oct 198954.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Gabon
2 Oct 198954.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Equatorial Guinea
24 Feb 199660.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Yugoslavia
4 Mar 200064.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina
9 Apr 200367.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Slovenia
9 Apr 200367.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bosnia and Herzegovina
12 Apr 200367.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to North Macedonia
21 Nov 200570.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Bosnia and Herzegovina
9 Jan 201175.3RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Slovenia
9 Jan 201175.3RetiredApostolic Nuncio to North Macedonia
22 Jan 201175.3AppointedVice-Chamberlain of the Apostolic Chamber
21 Nov 201176.1AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
18 Feb 201276.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Ponziano
18 Feb 201276.4Elevated to Cardinal
20 May 201276.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Ponziano
28 Dec 201681.2RetiredArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
4 Mar 202286.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Ponziano

MicroData Summary
Santos Abril y Castelló
Santos Cardinal Abril y Castelló
(born )
Archpriest Emeritus of Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlfambra, Diocese of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain
Ordained PriestCathedral, Pesaro, Diocese of Pesaro, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Teruel, Diocese of Teruel (-Albarracín), Spain

Please contact the Cardinal through the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1d03: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 11 May 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 91, Number 7,738
  • cpri: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025