Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raniero Cardinal Cantalamessa, O.F.M. Cap.

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine

Priest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1934 Born
19 Oct 195824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
28 Nov 202086.3Elevated to Cardinal
28 Nov 202086.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine

MicroData Summary for Raniero Cantalamessa
Raniero Cardinal Cantalamessa O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColli del Tronto, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
Ordained PriestBasilica, Loreto, Apostolic Administration of Loreto, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Cardinal Titular Church of Sant’Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine.

  • a priest for years
  • a cardinal for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2020
  • c1: CB, 26 Oct 2020
  • cdea: Bollettino, 28 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 28 Nov 2020

Quantcast