Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Friedrich Cardinal Wetter

Archbishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1928 BornLandau
10 Oct 195325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
28 May 196840.2AppointedBishop of Speyer, Germany
29 Jun 196840.3Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
28 Oct 198254.6AppointedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
12 Dec 198254.8InstalledArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
25 May 198557.2Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198557.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
2 Feb 200778.9RetiredArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
2 Feb 200778.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
30 Nov 200779.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Wetter:
Friedrich Cardinal Wetter (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of München und Freising {Munich}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015