Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Morelia

Archidioecesis Moreliensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Alberto Suárez Inda, Archbishop
  • Juan Espinoza Jiménez, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Carlos Suárez Cázares, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Octavio Villegas Aguilar, Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 22 November 1924
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Michoacán
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 17,710 (6,840 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Don Vasco
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquimorelia.org.mx/
  • Mailing Address: Costado Catedral, Frente Ave. Madero Pte. s/n, Apartado 17, 58000 Morelia, Mich., México
  • Telephone: (4)312-05-23;312-37-38
  • Fax: 312-37-44

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Michoacán
11 August 1536ErectedDiocese of México Diocese of Michoacán (erected)
12 February 1546Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Michoacán (From Seville (Spain) to Mexico (Mexico))
13 July 1548Territory LostDiocese of Michoacán Diocese of Guadalajara (erected)
15 December 1777Territory LostDiocese of Michoacán Diocese of Linares o Nueva León (erected)
31 August 1854Territory LostDiocese of Michoacán Diocese of San Luis Potosí (erected)
26 January 1863Territory LostDiocese of Michoacán Diocese of León (erected)
26 January 1863Territory LostDiocese of Michoacán
Archdiocese of México
Diocese of Querétaro (erected)
26 January 1863Territory LostDiocese of Michoacán Diocese of Zamora (erected)
Archdiocese of Michoacán
26 January 1863ElevatedDiocese of Michoacán Archdiocese of Michoacán
16 March 1863Territory LostArchdiocese of Michoacán
Archdiocese of México
Diocese of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)
Diocese of Chilapa (erected)
26 July 1913Territory LostArchdiocese of Michoacán
Diocese of Zamora
Diocese of Tacámbaro (erected)
Archdiocese of Morelia
22 November 1924Name ChangedArchdiocese of Michoacán Archdiocese of Morelia
13 October 1973Territory LostDiocese of León
Archdiocese of Morelia
Diocese of Celaya (erected)
3 January 2004Territory LostDiocese of León
Archdiocese of Morelia
Diocese of Irapuato (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Morelia
19501,100,0001,300,00084.6%291803712,96483681126ap1951
19661,835,0001,850,00099.2%3941155093,6051431,185105ap1967
19701,800,0001,825,00098.6%3921155073,5501251,272141ap1971
19761,660,0001,700,00097.6%404995033,300122825177ap1977
19801,819,0001,860,00097.8%3581104683,886132820195ap1981
19902,295,0002,342,00098.0%4031205234,3881511,070205ap1991
19992,850,0003,000,00095.0%4681125804,9132451,100242ap2000
20002,850,0003,000,00095.0%4841326164,6262451,100247ap2001
20012,948,0003,100,00095.1%4791326114,8242451,107251ap2002
20022,825,6543,006,01494.0%4821276094,6392451,107253ap2003
20032,836,7193,006,01494.4%4611285894,8162021,121255ap2004
20042,259,7842,378,72095.0%3951185134,40581871,067218ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 May 2014