Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Edwin Frederick Cardinal O’Brien

Grand Master Emeritus of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

Cardinal-Priest of San Sebastiano al Palatino


Motto: Pastores Dabo Vobis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1939 Born
29 May 196526.1Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
1990²50.7AppointedRector of the Pontifical North American College
1994²54.7ResignedRector of the Pontifical North American College
6 Feb 199656.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
6 Feb 199656.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thizica
25 Mar 199656.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thizica
7 Apr 199757.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of United States of America, Military
7 Apr 199757.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thizica
12 Aug 199758.3SucceededArchbishop of United States of America, Military
7 Mar 199858.9ResignedTitular Archbishop of Thizica
12 Jul 200768.2AppointedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
1 Oct 200768.4InstalledArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
29 Aug 201172.3AppointedPro-Grand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
29 Aug 201172.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
18 Feb 201272.8Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 201272.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Sebastiano al Palatino
15 Mar 201272.9AppointedGrand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
16 May 201273.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
25 Oct 201273.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Sebastiano al Palatino
8 Dec 201980.6RetiredGrand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
4 Mar 202282.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sebastiano al Palatino

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Edwin Frederick O’Brien
Edwin Frederick Cardinal O’Brien
(born )
Grand Master Emeritus of Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York, USA
Ordained PriestSaint Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York, USA
Ordained BishopSaint Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York, USA

Please contact the Cardinal through the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,700
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1s02: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • i: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2019
  • cpri: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2022
  • op.loc: CB, 21 Oct 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 29 Apr 2025