Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alberto Cardinal Suárez Inda

Archbishop of Morelia, Michoacán

Cardinal-Priest of San Policarpo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1939 BornCelaya
8 Aug 196425.5Ordained PriestPriest of Morelia, Michoacán, México
5 Nov 198546.7AppointedBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
20 Dec 198546.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tacámbaro, Michoacán, México
20 Jan 199555.9AppointedArchbishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
24 Feb 199556.0InstalledArchbishop of Morelia, Michoacán, México
14 Feb 201576.0Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 201576.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Policarpo

MicroData Summary for Alberto Suárez Inda:
Alberto Cardinal Suárez Inda (born ) Archbishop of Morelia

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Morelia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 8 Apr 2015