Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Robert Cardinal Sarah

Prefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1945 BornOurous
20 Jul 196924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Conakry {Konakry}, Guinea
13 Aug 197934.2AppointedArchbishop of Conakry {Konakry}, Guinea
8 Dec 197934.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Conakry {Konakry}, Guinea
1 Oct 200156.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
7 Oct 201065.3AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
20 Nov 201065.4Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 201065.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana
30 Jan 201165.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana
28 Feb 201367.7CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
16 Mar 201367.8ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
24 Nov 201469.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

MicroData Summary for Robert Sarah:
Robert Cardinal Sarah (born ) Prefect of Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2010
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 24 Nov 2014