Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick D’Rozario, C.S.C.

Archbishop of Dhaka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1943 BornPadrishibpur
14 Jun 196218.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
8 Oct 197229.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
21 May 199046.6AppointedBishop of Rajshahi, Bangladesh
12 Sep 199046.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rajshahi, Bangladesh
3 Feb 199551.3AppointedBishop of Chittagong, Bangladesh
25 Nov 201067.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Dhaka, Bangladesh
22 Oct 201168.1SucceededArchbishop of Dhaka, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Patrick D’Rozario:
Archbishop Patrick D’Rozario C.S.C. (born ) Archbishop of Dhaka

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Dhaka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,383
  • s: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013