Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Montenegro

Archbishop of Agrigento

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1946 BornMessina
8 Aug 196923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Messina, Italy
18 Mar 200053.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
18 Mar 200053.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aurusuliana
29 Apr 200053.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aurusuliana
23 Feb 200861.7AppointedArchbishop of Agrigento, Italy
17 May 200861.9InstalledArchbishop of Agrigento, Italy
14 Feb 201568.7Elevated to Cardinal
14 Feb 201568.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio
19 Apr 201568.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio

MicroData Summary for Francesco Montenegro:
Francesco Cardinal Montenegro (born ) Archbishop of Agrigento

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Agrigento.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,751
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015
  • i: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015