Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Franc Cardinal Rodé, C.M.

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

Cardinal-Deacon of San Francesco Saverio alla Garbatella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1934 BornLjubljana
29 Jun 196025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
198752.3AppointedSecretary of the Secretariat of Non-Believers
199358.3AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Culture
5 Mar 199762.5AppointedArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
6 Apr 199762.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ljubljana, Slovenia
11 Feb 200469.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
2 Apr 200570.5CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
21 Apr 200570.6ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life
24 Mar 200671.5Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 200671.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Francesco Saverio alla Garbatella
13 May 200671.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Francesco Saverio alla Garbatella
4 Jan 201176.3RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

MicroData Summary for Franc Rodé:
Cardinal Franc Rodé C.M. (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for Institutes of Consecrated Life and Societies of Apostolic Life.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino, 8 May 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,946

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013