Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gabriel Cardinal Zubeir Wako

Archbishop of Khartoum

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Atanasio a Via Tiburtina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1941 BornMboro
21 Jul 196322.4Ordained PriestPriest of Wau, South Sudan
12 Dec 197433.8AppointedBishop of Wau, South Sudan
6 Apr 197534.1Ordained BishopBishop of Wau, South Sudan
30 Oct 197938.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Khartoum, Sudan
10 Oct 198140.6SucceededArchbishop of Khartoum, Sudan
21 Oct 200362.7Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200362.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Atanasio a Via Tiburtina

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Zubeir Wako:
Cardinal Gabriel Zubeir Wako (born ) Archbishop of Khartoum

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Khartoum.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Dec 2013