Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lluís Cardinal Martínez Sistach

Archbishop of Barcelona

Cardinal-Priest of San Sebastiano alle Catacombe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1937 BornBarcelona
17 Sep 196124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Barcelona, Spain
6 Nov 198750.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
6 Nov 198750.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aliezira
27 Dec 198750.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aliezira
17 May 199154.0AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
7 Jul 199154.1InstalledBishop of Tortosa, Spain
20 Feb 199759.8AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
13 Apr 199759.9InstalledArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
15 Jun 200467.1AppointedArchbishop of Barcelona, Spain
18 Jul 200467.2InstalledArchbishop of Barcelona, Spain
24 Nov 200770.5Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200770.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sebastiano alle Catacombe
20 Jan 200870.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sebastiano alle Catacombe

MicroData Summary for Lluís Martínez Sistach:
Lluís Cardinal Martínez Sistach (born ) Archbishop of Barcelona

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Barcelona.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,520
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015