Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Cañizares Llovera

Prefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1945 BornUtiel
21 Jun 197024.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 199246.4AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
25 Apr 199246.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
10 Dec 199651.2AppointedArchbishop of Granada, Spain
24 Oct 200257.0AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
15 Dec 200257.2InstalledArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
24 Mar 200660.4Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 200660.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
21 May 200660.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
9 Dec 200863.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
28 Feb 201367.4CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments
16 Mar 201367.4ConfirmedPrefect of the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

MicroData Summary for Antonio Cañizares Llovera:
Antonio Cardinal Cañizares Llovera (born ) Prefect of Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino, 12 May 2006
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,668
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014