Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Madrid

Archidioecesis Matritensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • José Cobo Cano, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Juan Antonio Martínez Camino, S.J., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Jesús Vidal Chamorro, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Carlos Osoro Sierra, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Antonio María Rouco Varela, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 25 March 1964
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Spain
  • Square Kilometers: 3,663 (1,414 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archimadrid.es/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Bailen 8, 28071 Madrid, Espana
  • Telephone: 91.454.64.00
  • Fax: 91.454.64.18

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Madrid
7 March 1885ErectedArchdiocese of Toledo Diocese of Madrid (erected)
Archdiocese of Madrid
25 March 1964ElevatedDiocese of Madrid Archdiocese of Madrid
23 July 1991Territory LostArchdiocese of Madrid (Southern area of the Community of Madrid, from Chinchón-Aranjuez to Brunete-San Martín de Valdeiglesisas) Diocese of Getafe (erected)
23 July 1991Territory LostArchdiocese of Madrid (Southeastern area) Diocese of Alcalá de Henares (erected)
23 July 1991ElevatedArchdiocese of Madrid (became a Metropolitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Madrid
19501,901,5031,909,00399.6%9367521,6881,1261,6736,635281ap1951
Archdiocese of Madrid
19703,673,4243,682,87499.7%1,5001,7783,2781,1203,50112,365559ap1971
19804,320,0004,936,00087.5%1,9151,5003,4151,26512,9689,650638ap1981
19904,108,2684,964,48682.8%1,6641,4753,1391,30852,70510,866636ap1991
19993,110,0003,450,00090.1%1,4301,8993,329934123,2957,939463ap2000
20003,110,0003,456,40690.0%1,4311,8893,320936163,2417,845469ap2001
20013,155,8403,507,65890.0%1,3901,8653,255969143,2377,765474ap2002
20023,235,0003,595,00090.0%1,3901,8733,263991103,1927,735474ap2003
20033,345,0003,716,00090.0%1,4171,8663,2831,018113,1907,719481ap2004
20043,359,0003,746,00089.7%1,4081,8513,2591,030153,1437,673476ap2005
20133,615,0004,178,00086.5%1,4031,7483,1511,147292,5537,060478ap2014
20163,511,0004,040,00086.9%1,3901,6763,0661,145362,2186,648481ap2017
20193,316,8004,146,22580.0%1,2001,4052,6051,273311,9385,250476ap2020
20213,384,2004,282,00079.0%1,1231,4262,5491,327332,0215,185476ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Archdiocese of Madrid
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 57, Page 150, to Page 152
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 83, Page 1,009, and Page 1,010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 20 Feb 2024