Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bangkok

Archidioecesis Bangkokensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 18 December 1965
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Thailand
  • Square Kilometers: 18,831 (7,273 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholic.or.th/
  • Mailing Address: 51 Catholic Mission, Charoenkrung Road 40, Bangrak, Bangkok 10500, Thailand
  • Telephone: (02)233.87.12
  • Fax: 237.10.33

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Siam
1662ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Siam (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}
10 September 1841Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Siam Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}
4 May 1899Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Laos (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Bangkok
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Siam {Siam Orientale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Thibet
Vicariate Apostolic of Bangkok
30 June 1930Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bangkok Mission "Sui Iuris" of Rajaburi (erected)
11 May 1944Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bangkok Vicariate Apostolic of Chantaburi (erected)
17 November 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bangkok Prefecture Apostolic of Chieng-Mai (erected)
Archdiocese of Bangkok
18 December 1965ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bangkok Archdiocese of Bangkok
9 February 1967Territory LostArchdiocese of Bangkok Diocese of Nakhorn-Sawan (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bangkok
194928,7839,000,000.3%555552342198ap1951
Archdiocese of Bangkok
196945,5506,656,577.7%5229815628443929ap1971
198060,0007,816,000.8%467512149517646339ap1981
199066,96311,387,000.6%877716440819544545ap1991
199978,82512,001,721.7%1028118343021254147ap2000
200076,39113,065,565.6%1138119439323050049ap2001
200179,01512,000,000.7%1198820738123452051ap2002
200281,64612,398,000.7%1218720839222051651ap2003
200384,16012,241,377.7%1208620640821747051ap2004
200486,49312,471,646.7%1238620941322250451ap2005
2006111,51412,759,000.9%1288421252625248951ap2007
2012115,94513,226,721.9%1339322651327142054ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 8 Sep 2013