Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal Zerbo

Archbishop of Bamako, Mali

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Tuscolana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1943 Born
10 Jul 197127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ségou, Mali
21 Jun 198844.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bamako, Mali
21 Jun 198844.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Accia
20 Nov 198844.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Accia
19 Dec 199450.9AppointedBishop of Mopti, Mali
27 Jun 199854.5AppointedArchbishop of Bamako, Mali
28 Jun 201773.5Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201773.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Tuscolana

MicroData Summary for Jean Zerbo
Jean Cardinal Zerbo (born ) Archbishop of Bamako

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSégou, Archdiocese of Bamako
Ordained PriestSégou, Diocese of Ségou
Ordained BishopBamako, Archdiocese of Bamako

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Bamako.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,923
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • card: CB, 21 May 2017
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jun 2017