Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Dakar

Archidioecesis Dakarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Théodore-Adrien Sarr, Cardinal, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Senegal
  • Square Kilometers: 5,395 (2,083 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archeveche, B.P. 1908, Avenue Jean XXIII, Dakar, Senegal
  • Telephone: 889.06.00
  • Fax: 823.48.75

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Senegambia
6 February 1863SplitVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone} Vicariate Apostolic of Senegambia
Vicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas {Des Deux Guinées}
18 October 1897Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Senegambia
Vicariate Apostolic of Sierra Leone
Prefecture Apostolic of Guinea Francese (erected)
6 May 1931Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Senegambia Mission "Sui Iuris" of Gambia (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Dakar
27 January 1936Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Senegambia Vicariate Apostolic of Dakar
25 April 1939Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Dakar Prefecture Apostolic of Ziguinchor (erected)
Archdiocese of Dakar
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Dakar Archdiocese of Dakar
21 January 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of Dakar
Diocese of Ziguinchor
Prefecture Apostolic of Kaolack (erected)
6 February 1969Territory LostArchdiocese of Dakar Diocese of Thiès (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Dakar
194962,9691,933,3663.3%238401,574381357ap1951
Archdiocese of Dakar
1969105,4001,323,0008.0%269111790018328030ap1971
1980130,0001,366,0009.5%1278901,44413525727ap1981
1990215,8631,650,00013.1%3067972,22516526530ap1991
1999226,4041,959,34211.6%59671261,79618634533ap2000
2000230,9041,998,52811.6%59651241,86218933332ap2001
2001293,5353,010,3849.8%70721422,06717736233ap2002
2002331,1753,094,98310.7%67721392,382116136437ap2003
2003336,1073,094,98310.9%73691422,366118937338ap2004
2004475,2243,234,10014.7%77741513,14718738338ap2005
2006340,0003,179,00010.7%83561392,446216735842ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 23 Jun 2013