Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Arrigo Miglio

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1942 Born
23 Sep 196725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ivrea, Italy
25 Mar 199249.6AppointedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
25 Apr 199249.7Ordained BishopBishop of Iglesias, Italy
14 Jun 199249.9InstalledBishop of Iglesias, Italy
20 Feb 199956.5AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
25 Apr 199956.7InstalledBishop of Ivrea, Italy
25 Feb 201269.6AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
18 Apr 201269.7InstalledArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Arrigo Miglio
Archbishop Arrigo Miglio (born ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Giorgio Canavese
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ivrea, Diocese of Ivrea

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cagliari.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,917
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast