Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Durban

Archidioecesis Durbanianus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Wilfrid Fox Napier, O.F.M., Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Barry Alexander Anthony Wood, O.M.I., Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 January 1951
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 20,318 (7,847 Square Miles)
  • Description: comprises the civil districts of Camperdown, north of the Umlaas River, (except the farms of Mariannhill, Klaarwater, Dassenhoek, Welbedag and portion of Stockville), Durban, Estcourt, Inanda, kranskop, Lions River, Lower Tugela, Maphumulo, Umvoti, Weenen, Bergville and part of Msinga.
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholic-dbn.org.za/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, 154 Gordon Road, Durban 4001, KwaZulu-Natal; P.O. Box 47489, Greyville 4023, South Africa
  • Telephone: (031)303-1417
  • Fax: 312-1848

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Natal
15 November 1850ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Natal (erected)
2 July 1879Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Natal Mission "Sui Iuris" of Zambese (erected)
4 June 1886Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Natal Prefecture Apostolic of Transvaal (erected)
4 June 1886Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Natal
Vicariate Apostolic of Kimberley in Orange (erected)
27 August 1921Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Natal Prefecture Apostolic of Zululand (erected)
10 September 1921Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Natal Vicariate Apostolic of Mariannhill (erected)
19 April 1923Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Natal Prefecture Apostolic of Swaziland (erected)
Archdiocese of Durban
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Natal Archdiocese of Durban
23 June 1958Territory LostDiocese of Bremersdorp
Archdiocese of Durban
Diocese of Lydenburg
Prefecture Apostolic of Volksrust (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Natal
194974,4241,301,7195.7%4848884511048948ap1951
Archdiocese of Durban
1969133,8841812914791015761260ap1971
1980170,3241,875,2299.1%19871061,606113161773ap1981
1990215,0002,803,0007.7%24921161,8531311431076ap1991
1999225,2713,070,0007.3%251001251,8022324431074ap2000
2000234,6713,084,0007.6%2612386,1752716729574ap2001
2001217,7263,000,0007.3%271101371,5893132527873ap2002
2002217,4683,000,0007.2%261111371,5873033323574ap2003
2003209,1043,000,0007.0%251081331,5723033828374ap2004
2004205,3873,000,0006.8%271071341,5323034125675ap2005
2006211,0003,020,0007.0%321101421,4853034534374ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Apr 2014