Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Angelo Cardinal Becciu

Prefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

Cardinal-Deacon of San Lino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1948 Born
27 Aug 197224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ozieri, Italy
15 Oct 200153.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rusellae
15 Oct 200153.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Angola
15 Nov 200153.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to São Tomé and Príncipe
1 Dec 200153.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rusellae
23 Jul 200961.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cuba
10 May 201162.9AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
28 Jun 201870.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Lino
28 Jun 201870.0Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jun 201870.0ResignedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
1 Sep 201870.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
20 Jan 201970.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Lino

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Angelo Becciu (VIAF: 150151836504820400465)
Giovanni Angelo Cardinal Becciu (born ) Prefect of Causes of Saints

EventPlace
Birth PlacePattada, Diocese of Ozieri, Italy
Ordained BishopAnfiteatro 2001, Pattada, Diocese of Ozieri, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for the Causes of Saints.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,079
  • card: Bollettino, 20 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018
  • xccs: CB, 31 Aug 2018
  • i: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 8 Oct 2019

Quantcast