Catholic-Hierarchy DC

George Cardinal Alencherry

Major Archbishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabarese)

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1945 BornThuruthy
19 Nov 197227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabarese), India
11 Nov 199651.6AppointedBishop of Thuckalay (Syro-Malabarese), India
2 Feb 199751.8Ordained BishopBishop of Thuckalay (Syro-Malabarese), India
24 May 201166.1SelectedMajor Archbishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabarese), India
25 May 201166.1ConfirmedMajor Archbishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabarese), India
18 Feb 201266.8Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 201266.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
14 Oct 201267.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme

MicroData Summary for George Alencherry:
George Cardinal Alencherry (born ) Major Archbishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s/c: Bollettino, 26 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,918
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1b07: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 3 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Sep 2014