Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Tegucigalpa

Archidioecesis Tegucigalpensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 2 February 1916
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Honduras
  • Square Kilometers: 8,619 (3,329 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://arquidiocesistegucigalpa.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 106, Ave. Mons. Agustin Hombach 1933, Colonia Palcartagua, Tegucigalpa, Honduras
  • Telephone: 2236-2849; 2236-2886
  • Fax: 2236-2967

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Comayagua
1561ErectedDiocese of Santiago de Guatemala Diocese of Comayagua (erected)
2 February 1916Territory LostDiocese of Comayagua Vicariate Apostolic of San Pedro Sula (erected)
2 February 1916Territory LostDiocese of Comayagua Diocese of Santa Rosa de Copán (erected)
Archdiocese of Tegucigalpa
2 February 1916ElevatedDiocese of Comayagua Archdiocese of Tegucigalpa (Name Changed and Diocese raised to an Archdiocese)
6 March 1949Territory LostArchdiocese of Tegucigalpa Territorial Prelature of Inmaculada Concepción de la B.V.M. en Olancho (erected)
13 March 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Tegucigalpa Diocese of Comayagua (erected)
8 September 1964Territory LostArchdiocese of Tegucigalpa Territorial Prelature of Choluteca (erected)
19 September 2005Territory LostArchdiocese of Tegucigalpa Diocese of Yoro (erected)
2 January 2017Territory LostArchdiocese of Tegucigalpa Diocese of Danlí (erected) (El Paraíso)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Tegucigalpa
1950821,076846,46897.0%34427610,803449741ap1951
1966497,165547,21390.9%2257796,2932128ap1967
1970789,000850,31592.8%1767849,3926714239ap1971
19761,020,0001,122,00090.9%36468212,4394917533ap1977
19801,916,9491,946,14198.5%17597625,2237114641ap1981
19901,255,6181,364,80392.0%25648914,1081696436ap1991
19991,516,6611,849,79682.0%538513810,99019620645ap2000
20001,519,3521,858,70281.7%559615110,061110921050ap2001
20011,621,0001,971,48182.2%589114910,879110424655ap2002
20021,638,0001,992,48182.2%589114910,993110424655ap2003
20031,596,9471,996,18480.0%589315110,575110125548ap2004
20041,601,6372,135,51675.0%67981659,706111638748ap2005
20101,550,0001,801,00086.1%726313511,48146830556ap2011
20141,684,0001,955,00086.1%797715610,79419732058ap2015
20171,815,493.0%70681380730155bul:2Jan2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.7, 31 Aug 2016; Data: 16 Jan 2017