Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Bagnasco

Archbishop of Genova {Genoa}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Gran Madre di Dio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1943 Born
29 Jun 196623.4Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
3 Jan 199854.9AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
7 Feb 199855.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
11 Mar 200057.1AppointedArchbishop of Pesaro, Italy
20 Jun 200360.4AppointedArchbishop of Italy, Military
29 Aug 200663.6AppointedArchbishop of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
24 Sep 200663.6InstalledArchbishop of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
24 Nov 200764.8Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200764.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Gran Madre di Dio
26 Nov 200764.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Gran Madre di Dio

MicroData Summary for Angelo Bagnasco
Angelo Cardinal Bagnasco (born ) Archbishop of Genova {Genoa}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePontevico
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,237
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 18 Sep 2017