Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Vallini

Vicar General of Roma {Rome}

Cardinal-Priest of San Pier Damiani ai Monti di San Paolo

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

Member of the Secretariat for the Economy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1940 BornPoli
19 Jul 196424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
23 Mar 198948.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
23 Mar 198948.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tortibulum
13 May 198949.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tortibulum
13 Nov 199959.6AppointedBishop of Albano, Italy
27 May 200464.1AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
2 Apr 200565.0CeasedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
21 Apr 200565.0ConfirmedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
24 Mar 200665.9Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 200665.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Pier Damiani ai Monti di San Paolo
28 May 200666.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Pier Damiani ai Monti di San Paolo
27 Jun 200868.2AppointedVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy
27 Jun 200868.2AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
24 Feb 200968.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pier Damiani ai Monti di San Paolo
8 Mar 201473.9AppointedMember of the Secretariat for the Economy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Vallini:
Agostino Cardinal Vallini (born ) Vicar General of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,249
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 5 Nov 2014