Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Orlando Beltran Cardinal Quevedo, O.M.I.

Archbishop of Cotabato

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria “Regina Mundi” a Torre Spaccata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1939 BornLaoag
5 Jun 196425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
23 Jul 198041.4AppointedPrelate of Kidapawan, Philippines
28 Oct 198041.6Ordained BishopPrelate of Kidapawan, Philippines
15 Nov 198243.7AppointedBishop of Kidapawan, Philippines
22 Mar 198647.0AppointedArchbishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
30 May 199859.2AppointedArchbishop of Cotabato, Philippines
22 Feb 201474.9Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201474.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria “Regina Mundi” a Torre Spaccata

MicroData Summary for Orlando Beltran Quevedo:
Orlando Beltran Cardinal Quevedo O.M.I. (born ) Archbishop of Cotabato

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Cotabato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 22 Feb 2014