Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luis Francisco Cardinal Ladaria Ferrer, S.J.

Prefect of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Ignazio di Loyola a Campo Marzio

President of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”

President of the International Theological Commission

President of the Pontifical Biblical Commission


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Apr 1944 Born
17 Oct 196622.4ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
29 Jul 197329.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
9 Jul 200864.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thibica
9 Jul 200864.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
26 Jul 200864.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thibica
1 Jul 201773.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
1 Jul 201773.2AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission “Ecclesia Dei”
1 Jul 201773.2AppointedPresident of the International Theological Commission
1 Jul 201773.2AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Biblical Commission
28 Jun 201874.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Ignazio di Loyola a Campo Marzio
28 Jun 201874.1Elevated to Cardinal

MicroData Summary for Luis Francisco Ladaria Ferrer (VIAF: 59125839)
Luis Francisco Cardinal Ladaria Ferrer S.J. (born ) Prefect of Doctrine of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManacor, Diocese of Mallorca, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,935
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2017
  • card: Bollettino, 20 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, [28] 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Jun 2018

Quantcast