Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Cotabato

Archidioecesis Cotabatensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Orlando Beltran Quevedo, O.M.I., Cardinal, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 5 November 1979
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 9,575 (3,698 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's Residence, 141 Sinsuat Ave., P.O. Box 186, 9600 Cotobato City, Philippines
  • Telephone: (064)421-2918
  • Fax: 421-1446

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Cotabato and Sulu
11 August 1950ErectedDiocese of Zamboanga Territorial Prelature of Cotabato and Sulu (erected)
29 June 1951Metropolitan ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Cotabato and Sulu (from Cebu)
Territorial Prelature of Cotabato
28 October 1953SplitTerritorial Prelature of Cotabato and Sulu Territorial Prelature of Cotabato
Prefecture Apostolic of Sulu
17 December 1960Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Cotabato Territorial Prelature of Marbel (erected)
29 June 1970Metropolitan ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Cotabato (from Cagayan de Oro)
12 June 1976Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Cotabato Territorial Prelature of Kidapawan (erected)
Diocese of Cotabato
12 June 1976ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Cotabato Diocese of Cotabato
Archdiocese of Cotabato
5 November 1979ElevatedDiocese of Cotabato Archdiocese of Cotabato

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Cotabato
1950156,000680,59522.9%21217,428251412ap1951
1970426,212727,19358.6%747547,8926212026ap1971
Diocese of Cotabato
Archdiocese of Cotabato
1980360,000790,00045.6%1930497,346669324ap1981
1990507,000917,00055.3%2328519,9418710230ap1991
1999823,6401,545,29153.3%29295814,200479128ap2000
2000902,0291,591,76956.7%34306414,0944622228ap2001
2001902,0291,591,76956.7%34326613,6674822228ap2002
2002902,0291,591,76956.7%35306513,8774722228ap2003
2003956,7381,897,47650.4%41307113,4753922328ap2004
2004823,6401,809,61845.5%39327111,6004012728ap2005
2006856,0001,880,00045.5%39387711,1166821528ap2007
2013951,0002,088,00045.5%41448511,18811350531ap2014
20161,003,6202,202,00045.6%48398711,5359411132ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_d, v3.1.9, 15 Apr 2017; Data: 30 Jul 2017