Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Toribio Cardinal Ticona Porco

Prelate Emeritus of Corocoro, Bolivia

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Gioacchino ed Anna al Tuscolano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1937 Born
29 Jan 196729.7Ordained PriestPriest of Potosí, Bolivia
5 Apr 198648.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Potosí, Bolivia
5 Apr 198648.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Timici
31 May 198649.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Timici
4 Jun 199255.1AppointedPrelate of Corocoro, Bolivia
29 Jun 201275.1RetiredPrelate of Corocoro, Bolivia
28 Jun 201881.1Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 201881.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Gioacchino ed Anna al Tuscolano

MicroData Summary for Toribio Ticona Porco
Toribio Cardinal Ticona Porco (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Corocoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtocha

Please contact the Cardinal through the Territorial Prelature of Corocoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2012
  • card: Bollettino, 20 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 Jun 2018

Quantcast