Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raymundo Cardinal Damasceno Assis

Archbishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo

Cardinal-Priest of Immacolata al Tiburtino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1937 BornCapela Nova
19 Mar 196831.1Ordained PriestPriest of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
18 Jun 198649.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
18 Jun 198649.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Petra
15 Sep 198649.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Petra
28 Jan 200467.0AppointedArchbishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Mar 200467.1InstalledArchbishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil
20 Nov 201073.8Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 201073.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Immacolata al Tiburtino
3 Apr 201174.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Immacolata al Tiburtino

MicroData Summary for Raymundo Damasceno Assis:
Raymundo Cardinal Damasceno Assis (born ) Archbishop of Aparecida

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Aparecida.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 28 May 2014