Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bogotá

Archidioecesis Bogotensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Rubén Salazar Gómez, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Pedro Rubiano Sàenz, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 8 June 1898
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 4,019 (1,552 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesisbogota.org.co/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Carrera 7a N. 10-20, Bogota, D.C. 1, Colombia
  • Telephone: (1)350.5511
  • Fax: 35.7290

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
11 September 1562ErectedDiocese of Santa Marta Diocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada (erected)
Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
22 March 1564ElevatedDiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
16 February 1778Territory LostArchdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada Diocese of Mérida (erected)
31 August 1804Territory LostDiocese of Cartagena
Diocese of Popayán
Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Diocese of Antioquía (erected)
25 September 1835Territory LostArchdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada Diocese of Nueva Pamplona (erected)
29 July 1880Territory LostArchdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada Diocese of Tunja (erected)
1894Territory LostDiocese of Popayán
Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Diocese of Tolima (erected)
Archdiocese of Bogotá
8 June 1898Name ChangedArchdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada Archdiocese of Bogotá
23 June 1903Territory LostArchdiocese of Bogotá Territorial Prelature of Intendencias Orientales (erected)
1 September 1951Territory LostArchdiocese of Bogotá Diocese of Zipaquirá (erected)
29 May 1956Territory LostArchdiocese of Bogotá Diocese of Girardot (erected)
16 March 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Bogotá Diocese of Facatativá (erected)
6 August 2003Territory LostArchdiocese of Bogotá Diocese of Fontibón (erected)
6 August 2003Territory LostArchdiocese of Bogotá Diocese of Engativá (erected)
6 August 2003Territory LostArchdiocese of Bogotá Diocese of Soacha (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Bogotá
19501,799,0001,810,00099.4%1913905813,0964502,100173ap1951
19591,132,3891,152,38998.3%1954806751,6771,0602,884118ap1960
19651,950,0002,000,00097.5%2635598222,3727003,115133ap1967
19682,000,0002,122,11294.2%2454006453,1004004,515160ap1971
19763,115,2523,211,60997.0%3566601,0163,0661,3883,527182ap1977
19803,838,0003,957,00097.0%2896969853,8961,2923,602186ap1981
19904,556,0005,063,00090.0%3498111,1603,9271,6733,700249ap1991
19996,000,0006,850,00087.6%4929601,4524,1321,9294,975302ap2000
20006,093,4167,114,56885.6%4819491,4304,2611,6974,855323ap2001
20016,067,0297,084,34185.6%4359241,3594,464202,0094,503337ap2002
20026,544,0267,651,08885.5%4999251,4244,595381,8343,247340ap2003
20033,546,1864,140,00085.7%3828691,2512,834421,8023,060227ap2004
20043,279,6903,850,51885.2%4138081,2212,686371,2702,138227ap2005
20063,586,0004,184,00085.7%3942976915,189539972,604231ap2007
20123,880,0004,527,00085.7%5033938964,330969861,574244ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 13 Jan 2014; data: 18 Jan 2014