Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Emmanuel Cardinal Wamala

Archbishop Emeritus of Kampala, Uganda

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Ugo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1926 Born
15 Aug 195730.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Masaka, Uganda
21 Dec 195731.0Ordained PriestPriest of Masaka, Uganda
17 Jul 198154.5AppointedBishop of Kiyinda-Mityana, Uganda
22 Nov 198154.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kiyinda-Mityana, Uganda
21 Jun 198861.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kampala, Uganda
8 Feb 199063.1SucceededArchbishop of Kampala, Uganda
26 Nov 199467.9Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199467.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Ugo
19 Aug 200679.6RetiredArchbishop of Kampala, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Wamala (VIAF: 311817336)
Emmanuel Cardinal Wamala (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kampala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKamaggwa

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Kampala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Aug 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast