Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}

Archidioecesis Monacensis et Frisingensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Reinhard Marx, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Wolfgang Bischof, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Rupert Ferdinand Carl Thaddäus Antonius Maria Stolberg, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Friedrich Wetter, Cardinal, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Franz Dietl, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Bernhard Hasslberger (Haßlberger), Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 1 April 1818
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Germany
  • Square Kilometers: 12,082 (4,666 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.erzbistum-muenchen.de/
  • Mailing Address: Erzbischofliches Ordinariat, Postfach 330360, D-80063 Munchen; Kapellenstr. 4, D-80333 Munchen, Bundesrepublik Deutschland
  • Telephone: (089)213.70
  • Fax: 213.71.558

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Freising
739ErectedDiocese of Freising (erected)
Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}
1 April 1818ElevatedDiocese of Freising Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}
1 April 1818Territory AddedDiocese of Chiemsee (suppressed) Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}
Archdiocese of Salzburg
31 December 1927Territory LostArchdiocese of München und Freising {Munich} (Loding) Diocese of Passau
16 March 1928Territory AddedDiocese of Augsburg (Estate of Sondermeier) Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}
27 June 1930Territory LostArchdiocese of München und Freising {Munich} (House of Mathias Steurer) Diocese of Augsburg
11 November 1932Territory LostArchdiocese of München und Freising {Munich} (Territory of Petrus Hoeek) Diocese of Augsburg
9 April 1938Territory AddedDiocese of Augsburg (Faistenberg and Hohenleiten) Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}
9 April 1938Territory AddedDiocese of Passau (Lands belonging to the Schmid and Scham families (in Aresing); and Estates of Gasberg and Stöffling) Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}
7 January 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of München und Freising {Munich} (Taubengrub) Diocese of Regensburg
21 April 1959Territory LostArchdiocese of München und Freising {Munich} (Family property of Joseph Scherm) Diocese of Augsburg

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}
19501,744,5742,057,22084.8%1,3277792,1068281,0767,537551ap1951
19702,288,0852,854,35480.2%1,4642551,7191,3317138,007614ap1971
19802,200,0002,900,00075.9%1,2354821,7171,281357515,808753ap1981
19902,090,0782,924,90471.5%1,1124351,5471,3511056464,783755ap1991
19991,901,5703,269,00058.2%9444151,3591,3991575943,512755ap2000
20001,885,3503,304,00057.1%9314201,3511,3951695883,218756ap2001
20011,874,8353,343,00056.1%9384111,3491,3891746043,085757ap2002
20021,855,1533,392,40054.7%9364261,3621,3621886213,017757ap2003
20031,840,4253,415,00053.9%9284271,3551,3581936172,926757ap2004
20041,824,7583,425,00053.3%9154291,3441,3571936082,726757ap2005
20131,759,8963,603,36148.8%8064101,2161,4472555392,159748ap2014
20161,732,3423,683,77047.0%7493871,1361,524275161,832748ap2017
20191,740,3003,789,35145.9%6823531,0351,6812634661,673747ap2020
20211,764,5403,842,04245.9%6063549601,8382854621,461747ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Freising
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 255
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 156
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 198
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 190
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 205
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 219
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 275, to Page 276
  • Archdiocese of München und Freising {Munich}
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 20, Page 193, and Page 194
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 30, Page 228, and Page 229
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 30, Page 286, and Page 287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 19 Feb 2024