Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Scola

Archbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1941 Born
18 Jul 197028.6Ordained PriestPriest of Teramo-Atri, Italy
20 Jul 199149.7AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
21 Sep 199149.8Ordained BishopBishop of Grosseto, Italy
28 Sep 199149.8InstalledBishop of Grosseto, Italy
15 Jul 199553.6AppointedRector of the Pontifical Lateran University
14 Sep 199553.8ResignedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
5 Jan 200260.1AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
3 Mar 200260.3InstalledPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
21 Oct 200361.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200361.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
21 Feb 200462.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
28 Jun 201169.6AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
25 Sep 201169.8InstalledArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
7 Jul 201775.6RetiredArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Scola (VIAF: 22157098)
Angelo Cardinal Scola (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalgrate, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,647
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc: AT, 29 Dec 2016
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 13 Sep 2017