Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Adam Joseph Cardinal Maida

Archbishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Vitale, Valeria, Gervasio e Protasio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1930 BornEast Vandergrift, PA
26 May 195626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Nov 198353.6AppointedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
25 Jan 198453.9Ordained BishopBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
28 Apr 199060.1AppointedArchbishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
12 Jun 199060.2InstalledArchbishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
26 Nov 199464.7Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199464.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Vitale, Valeria, Gervasio e Protasio
14 Jul 200070.3AppointedSuperior of Cayman Islands, Antilles
5 Jan 200978.8RetiredArchbishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
5 Jan 200978.8RetiredSuperior of Cayman Islands, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Adam Joseph Maida:
Adam Joseph Cardinal Maida (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Detroit

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Detroit.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Aug 2014