Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Walter Cardinal Kasper

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity

Cardinal-Priest of Ognissanti in Via Appia Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1933 BornHeidenheim/Brenz, Germany
6 Apr 195724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
17 Apr 198956.1AppointedBishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
17 Jun 198956.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
16 Mar 199966.0AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
31 May 199966.2ResignedBishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
21 Feb 200167.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200167.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Ognissanti in Via Appia Nuova
3 Mar 200167.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
25 Mar 200168.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Ognissanti in Via Appia Nuova
2 Apr 200572.0CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
21 Apr 200572.1ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
1 Jul 201077.3RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity
21 Feb 201177.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Ognissanti in Via Appia Nuova

MicroData Summary for Walter Kasper:
Walter Cardinal Kasper (born ) President Emeritus of Promoting Christian Unity

Please contact the Cardinal through the Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,349

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015