Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-Pierre Cardinal Kutwa

Archbishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Emerenziana a Tor Fiorenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1945 Born
20 Dec 197024.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
11 Jul 197125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
15 May 200155.3AppointedArchbishop of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire
16 Sep 200155.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gagnoa, Côte d’Ivoire
2 May 200660.3AppointedArchbishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
18 Jun 200660.4InstalledArchbishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
22 Feb 201468.1Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 201468.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Emerenziana a Tor Fiorenza
26 Feb 201771.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Emerenziana a Tor Fiorenza

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Kutwa
Jean-Pierre Cardinal Kutwa (born ) Archbishop of Abidjan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBlockhauss

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Abidjan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 May 2006
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,048
  • c: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2014
  • cp: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • i: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017