Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raffaele Cardinal Farina, S.D.B.

Archivist Emeritus of the Vatican Secret Archive

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni della Pigna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1933 Born
25 Sep 195421.0ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1 Jul 195824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
25 May 199763.6AppointedPrefect of the Vatican Library
15 Nov 200673.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Opitergium
16 Dec 200673.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Opitergium
25 Jun 200773.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Opitergium
25 Jun 200773.7AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
25 Jun 200773.7AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archive
24 Nov 200774.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni della Pigna
24 Nov 200774.1Elevated to Cardinal
5 Apr 200874.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni della Pigna
9 Jun 201278.7RetiredLibrarian of the Vatican Library
9 Jun 201278.7RetiredArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archive
19 May 201884.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni della Pigna

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Farina (VIAF: 5058576)
Raffaele Cardinal Farina S.D.B. (born ) Archivist Emeritus of Vatican Secret Archive

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuonalbergo, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Vatican Secret Archive.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2006
  • c2+/ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,299
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2007
  • c1: CB
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast