Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dicastery for Culture and Education

Dicasterium de Cultura et Educatione



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Dicastery
  • United: 5 June 2022
  • Curial Office
  • Roman Curia
  • Description: Works for the development of people’s human values in the context of Christian anthropology, contributing to the full realization of Christian discipleship (Praedicate Evangelium, 153)
  • Official Web Site, Education Section: http://www.educatio.va/
  • Official Web Site, Culture Section: http://www.cultura.va/

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Pontifical Council for Culture
20 May 1982EstablishedPontifical Council for Culture
25 March 1993Territory AddedPontifical Council for Dialogue with Non-Believers (suppressed) Pontifical Council for Culture
30 July 2012Territory AddedPontifical Commission for the Cultural Heritage of the Church (suppressed) Pontifical Council for Culture
Dicastery for Culture and Education
5 June 2022UnitedPontifical Council for Culture
Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
Dicastery for Culture and Education

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Pontifical Council for Culture
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 85, Page 549, to Page 552

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 10 Feb 2024