Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jānis Cardinal Pujats

Archbishop Emeritus of Riga

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Silvia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1930 BornNautrani
29 Mar 195120.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 199160.4AppointedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
1 Jun 199160.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
21 Feb 199867.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
21 Feb 200170.2Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200170.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Silvia
19 Jun 201079.5RetiredArchbishop of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Jānis Pujats:
Jānis Cardinal Pujats (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Riga

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Riga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,544
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 11 Jun 2015