Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Calcagno

President Emeritus of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

Cardinal-Priest of Annunciazione della Beata Vergine Maria a Via Ardeatina


Motto: In Veritate Libertas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1943 Born
25 Feb 196724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
25 Jan 200258.9AppointedBishop of Savona-Noli, Italy
9 Mar 200259.0Ordained BishopBishop of Savona-Noli, Italy
7 Jul 200764.4ResignedBishop of Savona-Noli, Italy
7 Jul 200764.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
7 Jul 200764.4AppointedSecretary of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
7 Jul 201168.4AppointedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
18 Feb 201269.0Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 201269.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Annunciazione della Beata Vergine Maria a Via Ardeatina
27 May 201269.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Annunciazione della Beata Vergine Maria a Via Ardeatina
28 Feb 201370.0CeasedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
16 Mar 201370.1ConfirmedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
26 Jun 201875.3RetiredPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
4 Mar 202279.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Annunciazione della Beata Vergine Maria a Via Ardeatina

MicroData Summary
Domenico Calcagno
Domenico Cardinal Calcagno
(born )
President Emeritus of Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTramontana di Parodi Ligure, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Ordained PriestMajor Seminary, Chapel, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo, Cathedral, Genova, Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}, Italy

Please contact the Cardinal through the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2011
  • card: Bollettino, 6 Jan 2012
  • 1a01: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 11 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,144
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2018
  • cpri: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025